AK SB37 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Board of Pharmacy; relating to the licensing of certain entities and inspection of certain facilities located outside the state; relating to drug supply chain security; creating a position of executive administrator for the Board of Pharmacy; reducing the membership of the Alaska Commercial Fisheries Entry Commission to two individuals; relating to the duties of the commissioner serving as chair of the commission; providing that a single commissioner may exercise all powers and duties of the commission if there is a vacancy on the commission; providing for commissioner compensation; relating to tie votes of the commission; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Bd./commercial Fisheries Comm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 37(FIN) Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2018-07-25SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/24 CHAPTER 66 SLA 18
2018-06-28SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-07-20Senate9:35 AM 7/20/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-27HouseFN4: (GOV/DFG)
2018-06-27HouseFN3: (CED)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-27SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-04-24SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-24SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y15 N4 E1
2018-04-24SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-04-23HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 37(RLS) AM H
2018-04-23HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-04-23HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 31
2018-04-23HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-23HousePASSED Y35 N4 E1
2018-04-23HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-04-23HouseAM NO 4 ADOPTED Y32 N7 E1
2018-04-23HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UC
2018-04-23HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2018-04-20HouseHELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/23 CALENDAR
2018-04-20HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-04-20HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y17 N20 E3
2018-04-20HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UC
2018-04-20HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-04-20HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N27 E1
2018-04-20HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2018-04-20HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2018-04-18HouseHELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/20 CALENDAR
2018-04-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 37(RLS)
2018-04-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR
2018-04-17HouseRLS HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-17HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2018
2018-04-17HouseFN4: (GOV/DFG)
2018-04-17HouseFN3: (CED)
2018-04-17HouseNR: CHENAULT, KITO, REINBOLD, LEDOUX
2018-04-17HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2018-04-17HouseDP: CLAMAN, STUTES
2018-04-17HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR 31
2018-04-17HouseRLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 2DP 1DNP 4NR
2018-04-13HouseFN3: (CED)
2018-04-13HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2018-04-13HouseNR: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT
2018-04-13HouseDP: GARA, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-13HouseFIN RPT 7DP 3NR 1AM
2018-02-16HouseL&C REFERRAL REMOVED
2018-02-16HouseL&C, FIN
2018-02-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-14SenateVERSION: CSSB 37(FIN)
2018-02-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-02-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-02-14SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 V1
2018-02-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 37(FIN)
2018-02-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CALENDAR
2018-02-12SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-02-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2018
2018-02-07SenateFN2: (CED)
2018-02-07SenateDP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-02-07SenateFIN RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
2017-04-14SenateFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2017-04-13SenateFN1: (CED)
2017-04-13SenateNR: STEVENS, MEYER, GARDNER
2017-04-13SenateAM: COSTELLO
2017-04-13SenateL&C RPT CS 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE
2017-01-25SenateL&C, FIN
2017-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=SB37
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0037A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0037B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0037C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0037D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0037E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0037Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB37&jrn=2011&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB37&jrn=3389&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB37&jrn=3391&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB37&jrn=3416&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB37&jrn=3417&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB37&jrn=2835&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback