AK SB272 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to charges for rented motor vehicles, including cost recovery fees, and making a violation of the rented motor vehicle charge provisions an unfair trade practice.
Title
Rental Car Charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/7 CHAPTER 50 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER | |
2010-04-15 | VERSION: SB 272 | |
2010-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED Y37 E1 A2 | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 272 | |
2010-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-06 | NR: BUCH, HOLMES | |
2010-04-06 | DP: LYNN, T.WILSON, OLSON | |
2010-04-06 | L&C RPT 3DP 2NR | |
2010-03-24 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-24 | AM: GRUENBERG | |
2010-03-24 | NR: MUNOZ | |
2010-03-24 | DP: T.WILSON, PETERSEN | |
2010-03-24 | TRA RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM | |
2010-03-17 | TRA, L&C | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-15 | VERSION: SB 272 | |
2010-03-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-15 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 272 | |
2010-03-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-12 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-12 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, BUNDE, DAVIS | |
2010-03-12 | L&C RPT 5DP | |
2010-02-24 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-02-24 | DP: MENARD, MEYER, PASKVAN, DAVIS | |
2010-02-24 | TRA RPT 4DP | |
2010-02-10 | TRA, L&C | |
2010-02-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |