AK SB134 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance; relating to insurance data security; relating to mammograms; amending Rule 26, Alaska Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rules 402 and 501, Alaska Rules of Evidence; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ins. Data Security; Info. Security Prgrms
Sponsors
Sen. James Kaufman [R] | Sen. Forrest Dunbar [D] | Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] |
Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 134(JUD) Court Rule(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4/Table (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3/Table (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3/Table (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Judiciary HCS (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Judiciary HCS (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4/Table (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3/Table (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3/Table (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Judiciary HCS (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Judiciary HCS (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-09 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2024-10-09 | Senate | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/29 CH 39 SLA 24 |
2024-10-09 | Senate | 9:25 A.M. 8/6/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2024-05-15 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2024-05-14 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 134(JUD) |
2024-05-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2024-05-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-14 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-14 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2024-05-14 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS MOTION WITHDRAWN |
2024-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 134(JUD) |
2024-05-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2024-05-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR |
2024-05-13 | House | AM NO 6 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | AM NO 5 TABLED Y23 N16 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | AM NO 4 TABLED Y23 N16 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | AM NO 3 TABLED Y24 N15 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | JUD HCS ADOPTED Y38 N1 E1 |
2024-05-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2024 |
2024-05-06 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2024-05-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2024-05-06 | House | AM: SUMNER, ALLARD |
2024-05-06 | House | NR: C.JOHNSON |
2024-05-06 | House | DP: GRAY, GROH, VANCE |
2024-05-06 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 3DP 1NR 2AM |
2024-05-02 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-05-01 | House | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2024-05-01 | House | JUD, FIN |
2024-05-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-29 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 134(JUD) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-29 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-29 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2024-04-29 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 134(JUD) |
2024-04-26 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR, GIESSEL, GRAY-JACKSON, CLAMAN |
2024-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/29 CAL |
2024-04-26 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2024 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | NR: TOBIN, GIESSEL |
2024-04-22 | Senate | DP: CLAMAN, KIEHL |
2024-04-22 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2024-02-19 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-02-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, BISHOP |
2024-02-19 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE |
2023-04-21 | Senate | L&C, JUD, FIN |
2023-04-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Communications
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Court Rules
Data Processing
Disclosure
Insurance
Internet
Licensing
Privacy
Public Records
Communications
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Court Rules
Data Processing
Disclosure
Insurance
Internet
Licensing
Privacy
Public Records