AK SB123 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the bail forfeiture schedule and the penalty for the use of electronic devices while driving; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Use Of Electronic Devices While Driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/16 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 23 SLA 16 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | 3:53 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2016-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL VOTE TO RESCIND VOIDED |
2016-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | House | PASSED Y33 N6 E1 |
2016-04-17 | House | RESCIND ACTION ON PASSAGE UC |
2016-04-17 | House | VERSION: CSSB 123(JUD) |
2016-04-17 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | House | PASSED Y34 N3 E1 A2 |
2016-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 123(JUD) |
2016-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2016-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-16 | House | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/16/2016 |
2016-04-16 | House | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-04-16 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-04-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2016-04-16 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, CLAMAN, LEDOUX |
2016-04-16 | House | JUD RPT 4DP |
2016-04-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2016-04-07 | House | NR: KELLER |
2016-04-07 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, STUTES, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2016-04-07 | House | STA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2016-03-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2016-03-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-03-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 123(JUD) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2016-03-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 123(JUD) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-03-16 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-03-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, COSTELLO |
2016-02-26 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE |
2016-02-17 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | NR: STOLTZE, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-02-17 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE |
2016-02-17 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 2NR |
2016-01-19 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2016-01-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-01-19 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16 |
Subjects
Communications
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Data Processing
Highways
Internet
Media
Motor Vehicles
Sentencing
Transportation
Utilities
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Data Processing
Highways
Internet
Media
Motor Vehicles
Sentencing
Transportation
Utilities