AK SB12 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to state and public entity procurement, including the State Procurement Code, procurement preferences, contract awards, the use of small procurement provisions for certain amounts of leased space, the Alaska business license requirement for Alaska bidder and other procurement preferences, the proof of registration of construction contract bidders and offerors, the establishment and maintenance of lists of persons who want to provide supplies or services to the state, state agencies, and state instrumentalities, electronic bids and proposals, the chief procurement officer, small procurements, and writings; relating to the meaning of 'Alaska bidder'; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public Procurement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House: SB 12 Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/13 |
2013-09-10 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 59 SLA 13 |
2013-09-10 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | 9:27 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, GARA, JOHNSON, LEDOUX, STOLTZE |
2013-04-04 | House | VERSION: SB 12 |
2013-04-04 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-04 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2013-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12 |
2013-04-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FEIGE, COSTELLO, SADDLER |
2013-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-28 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2013-03-28 | House | NR: STOLTZE |
2013-03-28 | House | AUSTERMAN |
2013-03-28 | House | DP: T.WILSON, HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, GARA, EDGMON, COSTELLO, |
2013-03-28 | House | FIN RPT 9DP 1NR 1AM |
2013-03-27 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, HOLMES, KAWASAKI |
2013-03-20 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MILLETT, ISAACSON, KELLER |
2013-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-20 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, KELLER, HUGHES, ISAACSON, MILLETT, LYNN |
2013-03-20 | House | STA RPT 7DP |
2013-03-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTIS |
2013-03-04 | House | STA, FIN |
2013-03-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-02-27 | Senate | VERSION: SB 12 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-02-27 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-02-27 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI |
2013-02-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, DUNLEAVY, STEVENS, |
2013-02-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/27 CALENDAR |
2013-02-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-02-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2013 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2013-02-22 | Senate | DP: MEYER, KELLY, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH |
2013-02-22 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2013-02-06 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2013-02-06 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2013-02-06 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2013-01-16 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, KELLY, DYSON, MEYER |
2013-01-16 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2013-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/13 |
Subjects
Agriculture
Contracts
Courts
Disabilities
Employment
Executive Branch
Fish & Game (fish)
Forestry
Legislature
Ombudsman
Procurements
Public Corporations
Residency
Veterans
Vocational Training
Contracts
Courts
Disabilities
Employment
Executive Branch
Fish & Game (fish)
Forestry
Legislature
Ombudsman
Procurements
Public Corporations
Residency
Veterans
Vocational Training