AK HCR19 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - RETURNED TO RLS W/AM 2 PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - RETURNED TO RLS W/AM 2 PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Acknowledging the lessons learned from the 2011 Norway Policy Tour and encouraging investment in the state's oil and gas industry.
Title
Oil & Gas Policy/norway Tour
Sponsors
Rep. Bryce Edgmon [I] | Sen. Alberta Gardner [D] | Rep. David Guttenberg [D] | Rep. Bob Herron [D] |
Rep. Paul Seaton [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | RETURNED TO RLS W/AM 2 PENDING | |
2012-02-15 | AM NO 2 OFFERED | |
2012-02-15 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N20 E8 | |
2012-02-15 | EDT CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-02-08 | DP: THOMPSON, TUCK, MUNOZ, JOULE, OLSON, KELLER, FOSTER, HERRON | |
2012-02-08 | EDT RPT CS(EDT) 8DP | |
2012-02-03 | COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER | |
2012-01-18 | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG | |
2012-01-17 | EDT | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Economic Development
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Investments
Land
Leases
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Pipelines
Resources
Revenue
Taxation
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Investments
Land
Leases
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Pipelines
Resources
Revenue
Taxation