AK HB56 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - COSTELLO
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish Hmong-american Veterans Day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Hmong-american Veterans Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateCOSTELLO
2019-04-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
2019-04-22SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2019-04-22SenateSTA
2019-04-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-22HouseVERSION: HB 56
2019-04-22HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-04-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, VANCE
2019-04-22HousePASSED Y38 N1 E1
2019-04-22HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 56
2019-04-22HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-22HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N37 E1
2019-04-22HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-22HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2019
2019-04-03HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2019-04-03HouseDP: THOMPSON, REVAK, KREISS-TOMKINS, JACKSON, CLAMAN, HANNAN, DRUMMOND
2019-04-03HouseCRA RPT 7DP
2019-03-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP, THOMPSON
2019-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2019-03-08HouseDP: THOMPSON, KOPP, RAUSCHER, TARR, JACKSON, TUCK, LEDOUX
2019-03-08HouseMLV RPT 7DP
2019-02-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): REVAK
2019-02-20HouseMLV, CRA
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback