AK HB41 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to sport fishing services, salt water sport fishing operators, and salt water sport fishing guides; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sport Fishing Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2016-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/22 CHAPTER 30 SLA 16 |
2016-06-10 | House | 3:39 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-11 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2016-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1 |
2016-04-17 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 41(FIN) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N4 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 41(FIN) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FN4: (DFG) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, HOFFMAN |
2016-04-17 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 30 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 2DP 5NR NEW TITLE |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN3: (DFG) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | AM: STEVENS |
2015-04-17 | Senate | NR: GIESSEL |
2015-04-17 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MEYER |
2015-04-17 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2015-04-14 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2015-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 41(FIN) AM |
2015-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-13 | House | PASSED Y35 N2 E1 A2 |
2015-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 41(FIN) AM |
2015-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-13 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-13 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-13 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-06 | House | FN3: (DFG) |
2015-04-06 | House | NR: KAWASAKI, WILSON, GARA, GUTTENBERG, GATTIS |
2015-04-06 | House | DP: PRUITT, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON |
2015-04-06 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 5NR |
2015-02-13 | House | FN2: (DFG) |
2015-02-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2015-02-13 | House | NR: HERRON, FOSTER |
2015-02-13 | House | DP: ORTIZ, STUTES |
2015-02-13 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) 2DP 2NR |
2015-01-21 | House | FSH, FIN |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |