AK HB409 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to identification cards; relating to permanent motor vehicle registration; relating to vehicle registration fee rates; relating to changes of address; relating to driver's license fees; and relating to financial responsibility for motor vehicles.
Title
Vehicles;id Card,registrat.,license Fees;
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-27 | House | VERSION: CSHB 409(FIN) AM |
2018-04-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-27 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N12 E2 |
2018-04-27 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-04-27 | House | KREISS-TOMKINS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-27 | House | PASSED Y27 N11 E2 |
2018-04-27 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-27 | House | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2018-04-27 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y21 N16 E2 A1 |
2018-04-27 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y16 N21 E2 A1 |
2018-04-27 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC |
2018-04-27 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-26 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/27 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 409(FIN) |
2018-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-26 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-26 | House | SESSION CANCELED 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2018-04-18 | House | AM: KAWASAKI, TILTON |
2018-04-18 | House | NR: GUTTENBERG, PRUITT, ORTIZ |
2018-04-18 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, THOMPSON, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-18 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 3NR 2AM |
2018-04-13 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2018-04-13 | House | NR: LEDOUX |
2018-04-13 | House | DP: TUCK, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-04-13 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 1NR |
2018-04-05 | House | STA, FIN |
2018-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Age Of Persons
Fees
Insurance
Licensing
Media
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Senior Citizens
Age Of Persons
Fees
Insurance
Licensing
Media
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Senior Citizens