AK HB36 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/8/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/8/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting certain federal agencies or military services firing or using munitions on active ranges from prior authorization requirements of the Department of Environmental Conservation.
Title
Exempt Discharges From Use Of Munitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: HB 36 Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: HB 36 Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/8/13 |
2013-04-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/9 CHAPTER 5 SLA 13 |
2013-03-26 | House | 11:15 AM 3/26/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-03-15 | Senate | VERSION: HB 36 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-03-15 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | MEYER, KELLY, MICCICHE |
2013-03-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, BISHOP, COGHILL, EGAN, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, |
2013-03-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 36 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, MCGUIRE, DYSON |
2013-03-13 | Senate | RES RPT 5DP |
2013-02-06 | Senate | RES |
2013-02-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-02-04 | House | VERSION: HB 36 |
2013-02-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-02-04 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 A1 |
2013-02-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 36 |
2013-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, GARA, LYNN |
2013-02-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/4 CALENDAR |
2013-02-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-02-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2013 |
2013-01-30 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2013-01-30 | House | NR: TUCK, TARR |
2013-01-30 | House | DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, P.WILSON, OLSON, SEATON, FEIGE, SADDLER |
2013-01-30 | House | RES RPT 7DP 2NR |
2013-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2013-01-16 | House | RES |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13 |