AK HB298 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/26/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/26/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to confidentiality of performance review records and reports of the legislative audit division; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Confidentiality Of Performance Reviews
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Sen. Anna Fairclough MacKinnon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House: Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/26/14 |
2014-03-26 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/25 CHAPTER 5 SLA 14 |
2014-03-19 | House | 4:35 PM 3/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-03-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2014-03-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-19 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 E6 A2 |
2014-03-19 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-03-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 298(FIN) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-03-18 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2014-03-17 | Senate | FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH |
2014-03-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 298(FIN) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2014-03-10 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN |
2014-03-10 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR TECH TITLE CHANGE |
2014-03-05 | Senate | FIN |
2014-03-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-03 | House | VERSION: HB 298 |
2014-03-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, JOHNSON |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 298 |
2014-03-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-02-28 | House | STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-02-28 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, GARA, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, |
2014-02-28 | House | FIN RPT 10DP |
2014-02-05 | House | FIN |
2014-02-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Audits
Courts
Executive Branch
Government Organization
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Public Records
Universities
Courts
Executive Branch
Government Organization
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Public Records
Universities