AK HB275 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to electronic publication of certain municipal notices and to publication and electronic distribution of reports by state agencies.
Title
Electronic Distrib. Of Reports/notices
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Lindsey Holmes [D] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2014-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, HUGHES |
2014-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: NAGEAK |
2014-02-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/17 CALENDAR |
2014-02-14 | House | CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2014-02-12 | House | FN3: ZERO(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2014-02-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(GOV) |
2014-02-12 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-12 | House | STA RPT CS(CRA) 6DP |
2014-02-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(GOV) |
2014-02-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2014-02-07 | House | DP: HERRON, FOSTER, REINBOLD, OLSON, LEDOUX, NAGEAK |
2014-02-07 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 6DP |
2014-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK |
2014-01-24 | House | CRA, STA |
2014-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Communications
Data Processing
Executive Branch
Internet
Municipalities
Public Corporations
Public Records
Publications
Railroad
Universities
Data Processing
Executive Branch
Internet
Municipalities
Public Corporations
Public Records
Publications
Railroad
Universities