AK HB26 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to participation in matters before the Board of Fisheries and the Board of Game by the members of the respective boards; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Conflict Of Interest: Bd Fisheries/game
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-04-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2021-04-16 | House | AM: RAUSCHER |
2021-04-16 | House | NR: HOPKINS, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK |
2021-04-16 | House | DNP: MCKAY, GILLHAM |
2021-04-16 | House | DP: FIELDS, CRONK, HANNAN |
2021-04-16 | House | RES RPT 3DP 2DNP 3NR 1AM |
2021-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2021-03-20 | House | NR: VANCE |
2021-03-20 | House | DNP: MCCABE |
2021-03-20 | House | DP: STORY, STUTES, ORTIZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR |
2021-03-20 | House | FSH RPT 5DP 1DNP 1NR |
2021-03-12 | House | PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: FISHERIES REPLACED STUTES |
2021-02-18 | House | FSH, RES |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB26 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0026A.PDF |