AK HB247 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - COSPONSOR(S): GARA, TUCK
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - COSPONSOR(S): GARA, TUCK
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Protective Occupation Retirement Council; relating to participation of certain employees in the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the public employees' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Peace Officer/firefighter Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, TUCK |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK, GATTIS |
2014-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN |
2014-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2014-01-21 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2014-01-21 | House | L&C, FIN |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/14 |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Fire Protection
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Medical Care
Military
Public Employees
Retirement
Fire Protection
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Medical Care
Military
Public Employees
Retirement
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB247 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0247A.PDF |