AK HB222 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to increases of appropriation items.
Title
Increase Of Appropriation Item
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Rep. Lance Pruitt [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-04-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2016-04-15 | Senate | DNP: OLSON |
2016-04-15 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY |
2016-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT 2DP 1DNP 3NR |
2016-04-08 | Senate | FIN |
2016-04-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-07 | House | VERSION: CSHB 222(FIN) |
2016-04-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-07 | House | PASSED Y26 N13 E1 |
2016-04-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 222(FIN) |
2016-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON |
2016-04-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR |
2016-04-06 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2016-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-03-25 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2016-03-25 | House | DNP: GARA, GUTTENBERG |
2016-03-25 | House | DP: SADDLER, PRUITT, WILSON, GATTIS, MUNOZ, THOMPSON |
2016-03-25 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 2DNP 1AM |
2016-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, PRUITT, GATTIS |
2016-01-19 | House | FIN |
2016-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16 |