AK HB199 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/6/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/6/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to Department of Public Safety regulations allowing village public safety officers to carry firearms.
Title
Vpso Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/6/14 |
2014-07-14 | House | 10:30 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: HB 199 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 199 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(H.FIN/DPS) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-15 | Senate | DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT 5DP 2NR |
2014-03-14 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS |
2014-03-12 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | STA REFERRAL REMOVED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | CRA REFERRAL REMOVED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | MCGUIRE, STEVENS, OLSON, DYSON |
2014-03-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, GIESSEL, BISHOP, EGAN, MEYER, STEDMAN |
2014-03-12 | Senate | CRA, STA |
2014-03-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-10 | House | VERSION: HB 199 |
2014-03-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III, HOLMES, JOHNSON |
2014-03-10 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-03-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 199 |
2014-03-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | FN2: ZERO(H.FIN/DPS) |
2014-03-05 | House | NR: GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, STOLTZE |
2014-03-05 | House | DP: HOLMES, THOMPSON, MUNOZ, GARA, EDGMON, T.WILSON, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-05 | House | FIN RPT 7DP 4NR |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, ISAACSON |
2014-02-19 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA |
2014-02-19 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-02-19 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2014-02-19 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2014-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2014-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS |
2014-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2014-02-05 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-02-05 | House | NR: OLSON |
2014-02-05 | House | DP: REINBOLD, FOSTER, HERRON, LEDOUX, NAGEAK |
2014-02-05 | House | CRA RPT 5DP 1NR |
2014-01-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2014-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN |
2013-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER, JOSEPHSON |
2013-04-04 | House | CRA, STA |
2013-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |