AK HB131 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/25/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/25/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to abandoned and derelict vessels.
Title
Abandoned And Derelict Vessels
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Seaton [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] | Rep. Kurt Olson [R] | Rep. Benjamin Nageak [D] |
Rep. Beth Kerttula [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Frederick Dyson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/25/13 |
2013-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 65 SLA 13 |
2013-09-10 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2013-09-10 | House | 10:25 AM 6/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: HB 131 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DOT) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, GIESSEL |
2013-04-10 | Senate | CRA RPT 3DP |
2013-04-08 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DYSON |
2013-04-06 | Senate | CRA |
2013-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-05 | House | VERSION: HB 131 |
2013-04-05 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, GARA |
2013-04-05 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2013-04-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 |
2013-04-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2013 |
2013-03-22 | House | FN3: ZERO(DOT) |
2013-03-22 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2013-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2013-03-22 | House | DP: LYNN, FEIGE, ISAACSON, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, P.WILSON |
2013-03-22 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2013-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK |
2013-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, OLSON |
2013-03-14 | House | FN3: ZERO(DOT) |
2013-03-14 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2013-03-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2013-03-14 | House | DP: REINBOLD, OLSON, NAGEAK, LEDOUX |
2013-03-14 | House | CRA RPT 4DP |
2013-02-20 | House | CRA, TRA |
2013-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Auctions
Boats & Boating
Environmental Concerns
Law Enforcement
Liens
Marine Facilities
Municipalities
Property
Rights
Vessels
Water
Boats & Boating
Environmental Concerns
Law Enforcement
Liens
Marine Facilities
Municipalities
Property
Rights
Vessels
Water