AK HB100 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing June 27 of each year as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day.
Title
Posttraumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2017-04-06 | Senate | STA |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-05 | House | VERSION: HB 100 |
2017-04-05 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, GARA, PARISH, JOSEPHSON, TARR, LEDOUX, GRENN, SADDLER |
2017-04-05 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2017-04-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 100 |
2017-04-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-03-31 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, KITO, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-31 | House | HSS RPT 5DP |
2017-02-01 | House | HSS |
2017-02-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |