WY SJ0008 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION to amend the Wyoming Constitution to limit appropriations from the legislative stabilization reserve account and to authorize additional appropriations from the account for fiscal emergencies upon a three-fourths (3/4) vote of each house of the legislature voting separately.
Title
Legislative stabilization reserve account-spending limits.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |