WY SJ0005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION making an application to the United States Congress to call an Article V convention of the several states for the purpose of proposing the state legislatures' pre-approved single issue countermand amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
Countermand amendment.
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] | Sen. Wyatt Agar [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. Nathan Winters [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-19 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |