WY SF1002 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to emergency aid and emergency procedures in response to the COVID-19 novel coronavirus pandemic; clarifying immunity from civil liability; amending unemployment benefits; authorizing agreements with the federal government and the expenditure of federal funds; creating programs to avoid the eviction of needy persons; amending the unemployment compensation program; amending the worker's compensation program; providing additional authority to the governor; providing for a worker's compensation premium credit; amending a prior worker's compensation premium credit; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Emergency powers-Covid-19-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - Adopted SF1002JC001: 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - Senate - Adopted SF1002JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - Senate - Adopted SF1002JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Assigned Chapter Number 2 | |
2020-05-20 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0002 | |
2020-05-16 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0002 |
2020-05-16 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0002 |
2020-05-16 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0002 | |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-05-16 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-05-16 | House | House:Pursuant to JR 23-1 (h) referred directly to 3rd Reading |
2020-05-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-05-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to SCOW |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-05-07 | Bill Number Assigned |