WY SF0178 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for mountain lion pursuit seasons; providing for a special management permit for a mountain lion pursuit as specified; specifying the use of dogs to hunt, kill or pursue mountain lions; providing a penalty; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mountain lion pursuit seasons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-12-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-9-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-9-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 106 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0046 | |
2023-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0046 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0046 |
2023-02-21 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0046 | |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Concur:Passed 18-12-1-0-0 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-9-0-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-14 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2023-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-26 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |