WY SF0169 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; creating the state shooting complex development and oversight task force; providing duties of the task force; requiring reports; creating the state shooting complex account; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State shooting complex task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-11-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-11-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 146 | |
2023-03-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0072 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0072 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0072 |
2023-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0072 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-11-0-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-21 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-26 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |