WY SF0160 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0080
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to pesticides; providing for direct supervision by licensed applicators; providing definitions; providing rulemaking authority for reciprocal agreements; providing penalties; limiting local regulation of pesticides; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0080
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0080
2013-02-26 Assigned Number SEA0080
2013-02-26SenateDid Concur
2013-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22HousePassed CoW
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-21HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2013-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-02-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-04 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-01 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-30SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2013-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback