WY SF0149 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; increasing the number of complimentary hunting and fishing licenses as specified; providing for complimentary wild bison licenses; making conforming changes; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Complimentary hunting licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0076
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0076
2013-02-26 Assigned Number SEA0076
2013-02-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22HousePassed CoW
2013-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-21HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-19HouseRereferred to H02
2013-02-19HouseLaid Back Pursuant to HR 7-3
2013-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-08HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06
2013-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-02-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-01 Amendment Failed
2013-02-01 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-01SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-31SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-31 Amendment Failed
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-30SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-29SenateRereferred to S02
2013-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-29SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-22SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06
2013-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback