WY SF0145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Craft, Harvey and Miller Nayes: Representative(s) Gay, Gingery, Greene, Hunt and Peasley Ayes 4 Nays 5 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Craft, Harvey and Miller Nayes: Representative(s) Gay, Gingery, Greene, Hunt and Peasley Ayes 4 Nays 5 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; creating the Wyoming Medicaid False Claims Act; authorizing civil recoveries for the state and persons reporting false claims as specified; prescribing duties of the attorney general; providing procedures; providing for a limitations period and applicability of the act; providing definitions; prescribing criminal penalties as specified for failure to maintain required records; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid fraud recovery.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Craft, Harvey and Miller Nayes: Representative(s) Gay, Gingery, Greene, Hunt and Peasley Ayes 4 Nays 5 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-09 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Schiffer. Nays: Senator(s) Bebout, Burns, Case, Emerich, Hastert, Hines, Rothfuss, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 21 Nays 9 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-04 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Dockstader, Nutting, Schiffer and Scott Excused: Senator(s) Martin Ayes 4 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-04 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0145.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0145.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/SF0145.pdf |