WY SF0136 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; decreasing the property tax assessment rate for the all other property class as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Property tax relief-assessment rate reduction.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Andrew Byron [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] |
Sen. Robert Ide [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] | Sen. Troy McKeown [R] | Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 7-23-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Amendment adopted 18-12-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Amendment adopted 20-10-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Amendment failed 14-16-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 7-23-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Amendment adopted 18-12-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Amendment adopted 20-10-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Amendment failed 14-16-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-27 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-24 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 7-23-1-0-0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-01-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |