WY SF0132 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to planning and zoning; requiring military review and approval before construction of wind energy facilities; amending permit application requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wind energy facilities-military approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-06 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2020-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-21 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |