WY SF0129 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Medical Assistance and Services Act; authorizing payment for services rendered by a licensed pharmacist under the Medical Assistance and Services Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid coverage-licensed pharmacists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-12 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |