WY SF0127 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; establishing the Wyoming learn while you earn program; providing for students to take career technical education while also working; specifying requirements for approving programs and for student and employer participation in the programs; providing funding of the program as specified; providing for payments to community colleges providing approved programs and for payments to employers providing work experience and training; providing for agreements between colleges, high schools and employers; requiring review by the community college commission; requiring the creation of an account for the program; providing a sunset for the program; providing an appropriation and for a continuous appropriation; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming learn while you earn program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07Senatepostponed indefinitely
2021-04-07SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06SenateConcur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0
2021-04-06SenateReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-02House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2021-04-02House3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0
2021-04-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-04-01HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-31HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-31HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2021-03-26HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2021-03-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2021-03-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-22SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-18SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-17Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2021-03-17SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2021-03-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-01 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/SF0127.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/SF0127.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127H3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127H2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0127H2003.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/SF0127.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#-488
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#-528
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#341
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#-755
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#5378
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#5395
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0127#501

Bill Comments

feedback