WY SF0110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to small claims procedures; amending procedures governing service of summons; authorizing actions to be brought in the county where the cause of action or some part thereof arose; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Small claims procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Joe MacGuire [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Assigned Chapter Number 67 | |
2021-04-01 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0030 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0030 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0030 |
2021-03-30 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0030 | |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-17 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-24 | Bill Number Assigned |