WY SF0108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; modifying provisions of the Wyoming Retirement Act; increasing employee and employer contributions under the Act as specified; modifying the age and the combined age and service requirements for normal retirement benefits for general members hired after a specified date; modifying definitions; making conforming amendments; repealing archaic provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employee retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseDid Not Consider for Introduction
2020-02-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
2020-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-14SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 26-3-1-0-0
2020-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-10 Bill Number Assigned
2020-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback