WY SF0103 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development; amending the Gillette Madison water project as specified; providing for funding; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Gillette Madison water project financing.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Blikre [R] | Sen. John Hines [R] | Rep. Norine Kasperik [R] | Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] |
Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] | Rep. Sue Wallis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-22 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0036 | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0036 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0036 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0036 | |
2011-02-11 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-02 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |