WY SF0098 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; creating the Wyoming Budget Stabilization Act; specifying limits on state expenditures; specifying distribution of surplus funds; requiring review of related statutes; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Wyoming Budget Stabilization Act-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |