WY SF0097 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming education trust fund; repealing the Wyoming education trust fund; repealing related provisions; providing for a transfer of funds from the Wyoming education trust fund to the common school account within the permanent land fund; amending the distribution of trust funds available to public schools; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education trust fund transfer.
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 139 | |
2023-03-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0068 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2023-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0068 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-4-0-0 |
2023-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |