WY SF0090 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Nurse Practice Act; authorizing assessment of the cost of disciplinary proceedings as specified; amending grounds for discipline of licensees and certificate holders; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Nurse Practice Act-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-28 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 Assigned Chapter Number
2011-03-03 Governor Signed SEA No. 0079
2011-03-01 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0079
2011-03-01 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0079
2011-02-28 Assigned Number SEA No. 0079
2011-02-28 (S) Did Concur
2011-02-28 (S) Received for Concurrence
2011-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-25 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-10 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-10 (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-01 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2011-01-31 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-27 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-26 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-25 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-25 (S03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-20 (S) Rereferred to S03
2011-01-12 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback