WY SF0083 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; requiring public reports on state agency contracts for services and supplies and on revenues received by state agencies as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State spending and revenues-public reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28 S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
2017-02-03SenateNo report prior to COW Cutoff
2017-01-19SenateRerefer to S03 - Revenue
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2017-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback