WY SF0082 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; modifying the duties of the state board of education in approval of alternative scheduling for a school year; reducing the minimum number of class days required for public schools; reducing the number of professional development days for public schools as specified; requiring the school year to begin after Labor Day and recess prior to Memorial Day except as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Summer vacation preservation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-8-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-5-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-8-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-5-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2024-03-05 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2024-03-04 | House | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-8-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-19 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-5-0-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |