WY SF0077 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Wildlife and Natural Resource Funding Act; providing for funding of large projects under that act; specifying large projects approved for funding in 2019; specifying conservation easements shall include the state of Wyoming as a third party beneficiary; authorizing distributions from the Wyoming wildlife and natural resource trust income account for approved large projects; providing for reversion of funds; repealing statutes authorizing large projects that are completed; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2019 large project funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-18-1-0-1 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-0-0-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 75
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0044
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0044
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0044
2019-02-20 Assigned Number SEA No. 0044
2019-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 40-18-1-0-1
2019-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-12HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-0-0-1
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2019-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-24SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-24SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-23Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-23SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-23Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback