WY SF0070 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to recreation liability; specifying that a landowner is not liable for damages or injuries to a third party caused by a person using the land for recreational purposes; specifying conditions under which a state lands lessee is not liable to users of improvements on those lands; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landowner and lessee liability limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Assigned Chapter Number 69
2019-02-19 Governor Signed SEA No. 0035
2019-02-15HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0035
2019-02-14SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0035
2019-02-14 Assigned Number SEA No. 0035
2019-02-14House3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0
2019-02-13House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-11HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-01-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-23SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-18SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-18SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback