WY SF0065 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to livestock; repealing existing livestock remedy provisions and creating animal remedy provisions; providing definitions; providing exemptions; providing for powers and duties of the director of the department of agriculture; providing for registration and fees; providing for audits; providing requirements for packaging and labeling; providing for inspections and sampling; providing for rulemaking; providing for notice and seizure; providing for penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Animal remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-03-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-23 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-15 | (H05) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H05 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-21 | (S05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |