WY SF0063 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; modifying requirements for perfection of a security interest; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles-security interest perfection.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-18 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |