WY SF0061 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; providing for the salaries of county attorneys and county and prosecuting attorneys as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County attorneys-salaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Rerefer to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Digest/SF0061.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Introduced/SF0061.pdf |
Supplement | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Fiscal/SF0061.pdf |