WY SF0055 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0073
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to a statewide energy and natural resource education initiative; requiring the governor's policy office to oversee initiative development; specifying initiative parameters; requiring a report; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy and natural resource education initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0073
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 73
2013-02-26 Assigned Number SEA0073
2013-02-26SenateDid Concur
2013-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-21HousePassed CoW
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-15HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-02-11HouseRereferred to H02
2013-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-08HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04
2013-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-18SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-18 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-18 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-18SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-16SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-14SenateRereferred to S02
2013-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-14SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2012-12-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback