WY SF0047 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; authorizing data access to retirement information for model monitoring and other education data purposes subject to specified limitations; expanding monitoring reporting process; adjusting cost of education study components to the education resource block grant funding model as specified; modifying repayment interest for advance foundation payments to school districts; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School finance-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 5 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2013-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-26SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-26SenateDid Not Concur
2013-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-26 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22HousePassed CoW
2013-02-22 Amendment Failed
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-22 Amendment Failed
2013-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-08HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02
2013-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-21 Amendment Failed
2013-01-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-18SenateLaid Back Pursuant to SR 7-3
2013-01-18 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-17SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-17 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-17SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-16SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2012-12-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback