WY SF0043 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Chapter No. 50 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Chapter No. 50 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; repealing requirement license and permit fees be paid in cash or by certified check; repealing restrictions on license and permit holding by a mayor, city or town council member, county commissioner and law enforcement officer; modifying requirements for special malt beverage permits for public auditoriums, civic centers or events centers; modifying provisions related to hours of operations; modifying minimum purchase requirements for permit and license holders; modifying and clarifying application of population formula for licenses; repealing certain preference right; repealing limitation on issuance of restaurant licenses; repealing provisions related to prohibited acts in a licensed building or premises; repealing obsolete provisions; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-9-1-0-2 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-9-1-0-2 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-0-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-9-1-0-2 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-0-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Chapter No. 50 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-03 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0019 | |
2017-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2017-02-16 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0019 | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Concur:Passed 18-9-1-0-2 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-08 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-0-1-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-0-2-0-2 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-12 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |