WY SF0042 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Wildlife and Natural Resource Funding Act; providing for funding of large projects under that act; specifying large projects approved for funding in 2012; amending funding and timing for specified previously approved large projects; requiring specified conservation easements to include the state of Wyoming as a third party beneficiary as specified; requiring certifications regarding kickbacks and gifts; providing appropriations; providing for reversion of funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Large project funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-09 Governor Signed SEA0033
2012-03-06 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0033
2012-03-06 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0033
2012-03-06 Assigned Number SEA0033
2012-03-06 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-05 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-02 (H) Passed CoW
2012-03-01 (H) Placed on General File
2012-03-01 (H02) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-29 (H) Rereferred to H02
2012-02-29 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-29 (H06) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-28 (H) Introduced and Referred to H06
2012-02-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-27 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-24 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-23 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-21 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-21 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-16 (S) Rereferred to S02
2012-02-16 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-16 (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-13 (S) Introduced and Referred to S06
2012-02-13 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-01-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback