WY SF0041 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to travel and tourism; repealing sunset for film industry financial incentives program; creating an account; providing a continuous appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Film industry financial incentives program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-17 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0008 | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0008 | |
2011-02-11 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0008 | |
2011-02-11 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0008 | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Did Concur | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-07 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-18 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-21 | Bill Number Assigned |