WY SF0036 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks and cultural resources; authorizing the acceptance of lands as specified;
Title
State parks-acquisition of LX Bar ranch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA0030 | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0030 | |
2012-03-06 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0030 | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA0030 | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Did Concur | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-29 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-23 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |