WY SF0032 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 108 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Education in Accountability Act; exempting alternative schools from school level determinations required under the Wyoming Accountability in Education Act as specified; requiring assessment and refinement of alternative school accountability indicators; requiring a pilot of an alternative school accountability model as specified; requiring professional judgement panels; continuing operation of the alternative school technical advisory group; continuing operation of the select committee on statewide education accountability; requiring reports; appropriating funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative school accountability.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0032JC001: 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0032JC001: 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0032JC001: 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0032JC001: 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-20-1-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-20-1-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 108 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0064
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0064
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0064
2016-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0064
2016-03-04HouseAdopted SF0032JC001: 41-18-1-0-0
2016-03-04SenateAdopted SF0032JC001: 27-1-2-0-0
2016-03-02HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-02SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-02SenateConcur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0
2016-03-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-01House3rd Reading:Passed 39-20-1-0-0
2016-02-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2016-02-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-10 S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-4-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback